Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mitchell Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01246
Filed: September 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order for the Award of Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/19/2018. (Rosales, O)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of Remand for Further Proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42:405(g) and for Entry of Judgment In Favor of Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/14/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding plaintiff has demonstrated good cause for allowing the case to proceed and providing the requested extension of time. Accordingly, it is ordered that the order to show cause (ECF No. 13 ) is DISCHARGED, and plaintiff is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc, an extension to time to July 23, 2018, to file his opening brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order to Show Cause for failure to prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/11/2018. Show Cause Response due by 7/23/2018. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Hernandez
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?