Altimus v. Saint-Gobain Corp. of North America
Plaintiff: Justin Altimus
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Corp. of North America
Case Number: 1:2017cv01271
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE CASE IN LIGHT OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/2019. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/2/2018 and CONTINUING it to 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court grants t elephonic appearances, with each party directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The parties are also reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order GRANTING Defendant's 31 Request for telephonic appearance at the July 2, 2018 scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/26/2018. (Rosales, O)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/20/18. (Gonzalez, R)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING Motion for a More Definite Statement; ORDER GRANTING Thirty Days to File an Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/2017. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altimus v. Saint-Gobain Corp. of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Altimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Corp. of North America
Represented By: Anthony J. DeCristoforo
Represented By: Kelsey A Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?