Bealer v. Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Plaintiff: Antwoine Bealer
Defendant: Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Case Number: 1:2017cv01277
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal 40 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2018: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the parties and the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Hellings, J)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 35 Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/18. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Strike Request for an Extension of Time 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Action for Failure to State a Claim 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Striking May 14, 2018 First Amended Complaint and Directing Clerk of Court to File it in New Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/28/2018. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Order to Show Cause; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Copy of Screening Order and Granting Sixty-Day Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, re 20 , 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/18. Amended Complaint Due Within Sixty-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in Writing Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/18. Show Cause Response Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Notice Regarding IFP 602 Administrative Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2018. (Flores, E)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be Dismissed, without prejudice, for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee or submit an appliction to proceed in forma pauperis in compliance with the Court's order re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Antwoine Bealer ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/17. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COPY of ORDER Filed in Case No. 1:16-cv-0367-DAD-SKO, Directing Clerk to Open New Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bealer v. Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwoine Bealer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Kern Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?