Garcia v. Garcia, et al.
Plaintiff: Marco A Garcia
Defendant: Ruben Garcia, Blake Bursiaga, Collier and Fowler
Case Number: 1:2017cv01313
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF;ORDER EXTENDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2020. ( Discovery due by 1/18/2021, Dispositive Motions filed by 3/18/2021)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 39 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Discovery Requests; Forty-Five (45) Day Deadline; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants' to Re-Serve Courtesy Copies of April 9, 2019 Discovery Requests on Plaintiff; Seven (7) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/10/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 31 Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Award of Sanctions; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Reasonable Expenses Incurred in the amount of $615.00 and STAYING ORDER in Light of Plaintiff's Indigency; ORDER RESETTING Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/19/2020. (30-Day Deadline) (Discovery Deadline: October 18, 2020 and Dispositive Motion Deadline: December 18, 2020) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Reinstating Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING 36 Defendants' Motion for Order on Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER GRANTING 34 Defendants' Moti on to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/2020. Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Compel due within twenty-one (21) days. Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines are Vacated. (Jessen, A)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel and directing the parties to meet and confer 31 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER lifting Stay of Proceedings and ORDER vacating 2/28/2019 Settlement Conference 20 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2018. Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/13/2018. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain 1 Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/10/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/27/2018. (Flores, E)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Letter from Plaintiff re: Service of Process 6 ; ORDER Regarding Letter from Plaintiff re: Payment of Filing Fee; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-serve October 4, 2017 Order on Sheriff of Kings County Jail, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2017. (Sent Order No. 4 and IFP application to : Sheriff of the Kings County Jail at, Attn: Inmate Trust Account, 1570 Kings County Drive Hanford, California 93230; and at P.O Box 1699 Hanford, CA 93230, as directed in this order)(Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Garcia, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco A Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Bursiaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?