Avila v. Brown
Plaintiff: Daniel Avila
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Case Number: 1:2017cv01328
Filed: October 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REVOKING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal 36 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/25/2018: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the parties and the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Hellings, J)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's action be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim for relief re 21 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Daniel Avila ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/6/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Obtain Copy of Original Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?