Martinez Perales v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Evangelina Martinez Perales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01353
Filed: October 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018. Response due by 10/31/2018; Reply due by 11/19/2018. (Hall, S)
August 13, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2018. Opening brief due by 8/16/2018. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2018. Opening Brief due by 8/9/2018. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED APRIL 20, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2018. The Court ORDERS: the Order to Show Cause dated April 20, 2018 (Doc. 12 ) is DISCHARGED. (Valdez, E)
April 20, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/20/2018. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 12, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/2017. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Perales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangelina Martinez Perales
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?