Alvarado v. County of Tulare
Plaintiff: Daniel Dean Alvarado, Jr.
Defendant: County of Tulare
Case Number: 1:2017cv01396
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 27 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Obey Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/10/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Obey Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/28/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING 23 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve May 21, 2019 Order Directing Plaintiff to Submit Service Documents; and ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Completed Service Documents or Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/28/2020. Completed Service Documents or Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/09/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/28/2019. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Adopting 19 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defenandants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/17/19. County of Tulare terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER vacating 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of certain claims and defendants 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/31/2048. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/19/2018.(Flores, E)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Transfer Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration re 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Sanctions (Rule 37),without prejudice, as premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 3 Application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. County of Tulare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dean Alvarado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?