Heckathorn v. Holland
Plaintiff: Joshua Heckathorn
Defendant: Kim Holland
Case Number: 1:2017cv01416
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Close the Action (Voluntary Dismissal),signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/3/2018. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 64 Stipulation to Take Plaintiff's Deposition in Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/2/2018. (Hall, S)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/4/2018. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/1/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 7/1/2018; Non-Expert 5/10/2019; Expert 6/5/2019. Mid- Discovery Status Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/19/2019; Hearing by 7/17/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: File d by 8/5/2019; Hearing by 9/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference (Doc. 39 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2018. The Court ORDERS: (1) No later than May 11, 2018, the defendants SHALL file their substitutions of counsel, if that is their desire; (2) The scheduling conference is CONTINUED to May 21, 2018 at 8:45 a.m. (Valdez, E)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2018. First Amended Complaint due by 4/13/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 5/7/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 22 Request for Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/4/2018. (Hall, S)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 15 Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2018. Defendant's responsive pleading due by 4/10/2018. The Order to Show Cause 17 is DISCHARGED. (Hall, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to PLAINTIFF and HIS COUNSEL to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/26/2018. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2018 is CONTINUED to 4/12/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING 9 the Stipulation for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint and Continuing the Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2017. First Amended Complaint due by 1/12/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 3/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING 7 the Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2017. Responsive pleading due by 12/8/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heckathorn v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Heckathorn
Represented By: Kresta Nora Daly
Represented By: Mark Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?