Huapaya v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Huapaya
Defendant: D. Davey and K. Witt
Case Number: 1:2017cv01441
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 63 Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2020. (Marrujo, C)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Proceed to Trial or for Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/21/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING 52 Findings and Recommendations and Granting Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/26/19. (Marrujo, C)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/18/2019. (Flores, E)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2019. Motion Deadline: 6/27/2019. (Jessen, A)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Enrique Huapaya, CDCR# AN-2641, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to transport inmate, Enrique Huapaya for a Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Appointment Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2018. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending certain claims be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim for relief 21 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Accept Late Filing of Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2018. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huapaya v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Huapaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?