White v. Blue Pearl Home Care LLC et al

Plaintiff: Teresito White
Defendant: Blue Pearl Home Care LLC, Petro Crisostomo, Christine Crisostomo, Imelda Valdez and Devoted Home Care, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01466
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Entire Action and Continuing Jurisdiction of the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING DATES AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS. Based upon the settlement of this action, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending matters and dates in this action are VACATED; and Dispositional documents shall be filed on or before March 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/2018. (Hernandez, M)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/23/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 5/21/2018; Expert 7/16/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bak ersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/21/2018; Hearing by 6/18/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/23/2018; Hearing by 6/18/2018. Settlement Conference set for 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Bench Trial set for 9/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Blue Pearl Home Care LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresito White
Represented By: Nina Jane Baumler
Represented By: Dennis William Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Pearl Home Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Crisostomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Crisostomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devoted Home Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?