Drake v. Kernan, et al.
Petitioner: Sam Drake
Respondent: Scott Kernan, Kathleen Allison, Brian Moak, Kurtis Swart, M Sexton, G. Navarro, M. L. Gonzales, A. Guillen, J. Sherman, D. Goree, C Wilson, Kim Green, V Sosa and T. Akin
Case Number: 1:2017cv01500
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 89 Defendants' Second Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/24/2020. (Rivera, O)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING 85 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2020. Exhaustion Motion due by 6/17/2020. (Jessen, A)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 83 Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2019. ( Discovery due by 9/17/2020, Dispositive Motions filed by 11/18/2020, Amended Pleading deadline due by 7/17/2020, Exhaustion-Related Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/17/2020.) (Orozco, A)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2019. Exhaustion Motion filed by 2/18/2020. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/18/2020. (Jessen, A)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING 72 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Request for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/6/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REGARDING Defendants' 77 Request for Clarification of the Court's August 12, 2019 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Response to Outstanding Discovery Requests on or before November 15, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2019. (Flores, E)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Further Status Report within Ten Days from the Date of Service of this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/07/2019. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendants' 68 Request for Deadline On Or Before September 27, 2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/19. Responses due by 9/27/2019. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Granting Defendants' 53 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and Dismissing Conspiracy Claim, without Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/23/2019. (Flores, E)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 Motion to Compel ; Plaintiff to file a status report by October 10, 2019; All deadlines set forth in the Court's December 27, 2018 are VACATED to be reset, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/9/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 60 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 53 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/19. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying without Prejudice, Defendants' Motion to Compel, Granting in Part Defendants' Request to Modify the Scheduling Order, and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline as Unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/02/2019. (Flores, E)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying Defendants' Request for separate exhaustion deadline as moot 44 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Second 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 28 Findings and Recommendations, DISMISSING Certain Claims, and Referring the Matter Back to the Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/1/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's March 9, 2018 Notice, Directing Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff Copy of February 23, 2018 Order, and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to Either File an Amended Complaint OR Notify the Court of Intent to Proceed Only on Claims Found to be Cognizable 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/12/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/13/2018. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Kernan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sam Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurtis Swart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. L. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Goree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: V Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?