Rojas et al v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Rojas, Sarah Lara, Ivett Ayestas and Claudia Medina
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Scott Kernan, Derral Adams, Deborah K. Johnson, Timothy Tegtmeyer, Jason Collier, Herrera, Reynolds, Israel Trevino, Abdel Dalie, Gilbert Rubalcava, Valencia and Del Toro
Case Number: 1:2017cv01514
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting 30 Defendants' Motion for Misjoinder and Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGIATRATE JUDGE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/19/2018. Hearing on defendants' 30 motion for misjoinder and to dismiss the complaint currently set for 9/5/2018 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, is ADVANCED to 8/29/2018, at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Thorp, J)
May 23, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2018. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging the Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2018. Court ORDERS the order to show cause is DISCHARGED. (Valdez, E)
April 24, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RECLASSIFYING THIS CASE AS A CIVIL MATTER; ORDER to the Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE why this complaint against the Defendants in their official capacities on the 42:1983 claims and the individual capacity claims based upon the ADA should not be dismissed,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/24/2018. Show Cause Response due 7-Day Deadline. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 8, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/7/2018. (Kusamura, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Rojas
Represented By: Emily Rose Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lara
Represented By: Emily Rose Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivett Ayestas
Represented By: Emily Rose Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Medina
Represented By: Emily Rose Johns
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Tegtmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdel Dalie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Rubalcava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?