Chavez v. Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joyce Chavez
Defendant: Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01515
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case (Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2018.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
August 30, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS. All pending matters and dates are VACATED. The parties shall file dispositional documents on or before October 30, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2018. (Rosales, O)
February 7, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/18. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Chavez
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Represented By: George Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?