Venable v. Patel
Plaintiff: Elvis Venable
Defendant: Patel
Case Number: 1:2017cv01519
Filed: November 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 28 , 33 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 33 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/2019. Objections to F&R due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgement; Referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/22/2019. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) Days. (Orozco, A)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/19/2019. 21-Day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING ADR Settlement Conference Set for September 27, 2018 and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/31/2018. (Jessen, A)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Request for Status 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/19/2018: Motion RESOLVED. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venable v. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?