Maraglino v. Espinosa et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy Grace Marie Maraglino
Defendant: J. Espinosa and C. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2017cv01535
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal re 32 USCA Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 22 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Federal Claim for Relief; Fourteen-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/5/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Serve Copies on Plaintiff 1 , 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/19. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28:1915A, for failure to obey a Court order, and for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ;referred to Judge O'Neill; New Case Number is 1:17-cv-01535 LJO-BAM (PC),signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2018. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maraglino v. Espinosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Grace Marie Maraglino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?