Martinez v. Department of Human Resources
Plaintiff: Gabriel Martinez
Defendant: Department of Human Resources
Case Number: 1:2017cv01577
Filed: November 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice. These findings and recommendations are submitted to the district judge assigned to the case, pursuant to the provisions of Title 28 U.S.C. Sect ion 636(b)(l). Within fourteen days after being served with these findings and recommendations, Plaintiff may file written objections with the court. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recomme ndations." Plaintiff is advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may result in the waiver of rights on appeal. Wilkerson v. Wheeler, 772 F.3d 834, 839 (9th Cir. 2014) (quoting Baxter v. Sullivan, 923 F.2d 1391, 1394 (9th Cir. 1991)). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why this Case should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Show Cause Response, if any, to be Filed in Writing within 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/30/17. Amended Motion for IFP or Filing Fee Due Within 14-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Department of Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?