Bradford v. Sherman, et al.
Plaintiff: Dwight Larry Bradford
Defendant: Stu Sherman, Reynoso, S. Marsh and Ruelas
Case Number: 1:2017cv01601
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/3/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's attorney's Request for Authority to Incur Costs by appointed pro bono counsel Caroline M. Lutz. (Crouch, J)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case re 49 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/22/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings and Discharging Writs of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/18/2019. (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESIFICANDUM to Transport Dwight Larry Bradford, CDC# D-75443, for Settlement Conference on October 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESIFICANDUM to Transport Dwight Larry Bradford, CDC# D-75443, for Settlement Conference on October 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on Stipulation to extend stay of action 39 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/14/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Sant Agata, S)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Post-Screening ADR Project and Staying the Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/27/2019. Notice Regarding Settlement due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/23/2019. (Caroline M. Lutz added as Counsel for Dwight Larry Bradford)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Plaintiff's claims under California Law should not be dismissed for failure to comply with California's Government Claims Act signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/10/2019. Show Cause Response due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST SCREENING ORDER; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Sherman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Larry Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?