Goodwin v. Spearman
Petitioner: Patrick Glenn Goodwin
Respondent: Spearman
Case Number: 1:2017cv01604
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and Close Case; ORDER Declining Issuance of Certificate of Appealability signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/082019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/28/2019. (Flores, E)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER reassigning case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2019. The new case number is 1:17-cv-01604-JLT-(HC). (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Summarily Dismiss Unexhausted 1 Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/08/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/2/2018. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Glenn Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?