Brock v. Tuolumne County Sheriffs
Plaintiff: David Lee Brock
Defendant: Tuolumne County Sheriffs
Case Number: 1:2017cv01610
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations to grant in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike 51 , 52 , 56 , 59 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2020. 14-Day Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant In Part Defendants' 56 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/10/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 49 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss; and ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/16/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss and Grant Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/15/2020. Objections to F&R Due Within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2020. (Jessen, A)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 35 , 38 Motions for Extension of Time, and GRANTING 33 Motion for Receipt Verification, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2019. (Orozco, A)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause; granting Plaintiff's Request for Instruction; and denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 25 , 26 , 29 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/25/2019. Third Amended Complaint due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Enter Default and Judgment; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/2019. Show Cause Response due by 4/5/2019.(Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Enter Default and Judgment; and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/8/2019. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days.(Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 20 Motion for the Court to Issue a Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/9/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Doe 2 and the Second Claim; ORDER Authorizing Plaintiff to Conduct Discovery to Determine the Identities of Doe 1 and Doe 3 10 ; CASE ASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. New Case No. 1:17-cv-01610 LJO JLT (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/2018. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock v. Tuolumne County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuolumne County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?