Lipsey v. Hand-Ronga, et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Defendant: N. Hand-Ronga, S. Kernan, C. Bell, City of Corcoran and D. Davey
Case Number: 1:2017cv01704
Filed: December 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING this Case, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim; Order for Clerk to Close Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/19/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Orozco, A)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 32 Case be Dismissed, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/5/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Entered on August 7, 2019; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff LEAVE to AMEND and DIRECTING Clerk to FILE Fourth Amended Complaint Lodged on August 26, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/16/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case be Dismissed, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim re 23 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/7/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 26 Motion to Expedite Screening of Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Request to Expedite Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/5/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Leave to Amend the Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged on February 7, 2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/12/19. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for referral to the VDRP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/12/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 16 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within Thirty Days; Thirty Day Deadline to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/8/18. (Second Amended Complaint 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/19/2018. (Flores, E)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Motion to Expedite Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/29/18. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipsey v. Hand-Ronga, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Hand-Ronga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?