Lipsey v. Medina, et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Defendant: Medina, R. Godwin, J. Perez, D. Goree, S. Kernan, Carter and Supervisor
Case Number: 1:2017cv01705
Filed: December 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Adopting In Part 18 Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/16/19. Second Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 11 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Request for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 9 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/23/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Request for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 9 ; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge to this Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/14/18. This Case is Assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The New Case No. is: 1:17-cv-01705-LJO-MJS. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipsey v. Medina, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lipsey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?