Harris v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Devonte B Harris
Defendant: Consuelo Martin, Carlos Munoz, Robert Zamora, Timothy Candia, Alfred J. Hernandez and Jami Bowechop
Case Number: 1:2017cv01752
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/1/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/31/19. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING Time to File Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/29/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte B Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consuelo Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Candia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred J. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Bowechop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?