USA v. In the Matter of the Extradition of Vladimar Blasko to the Slovak Republic

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: In the Matter of the Extradition of Vladimar Blasko to the Slovak Republic
Case Number: 1:2017mc00067
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Deliver Certified Copy of Amended Certification of Extraditability to Assistant United States Attorney and Close This Action 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 27, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/26/2019. (Hernandez, M)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 58 GOVERNMENTS MOTION TO REVOKE BAIL AND INCREASING BAIL AMOUNT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Governments motion to revoke bail is DENIED; Mr. Blasko shall remain released on a bail amount of one hundred ninety thousand dollars (&# 036;190,000.00) to be secured by forty thousand dollars ($40,000.00) in cash and a one hundred fifty thousand dollar ($150,000.00) property bond; The bonds shall be posted and in place by Friday, March 1, 2018;A status conference is set for Monday, February 11, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; and Mr. Blasko shall appear at the February 11, 2019 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2019. (Hernandez, M)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (Additional) Condition Setting of Release as to Vladimir Blasko, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2018: Defendant must appear on 1/22/2019 at 11:00 AM, before Magistrate Boone. (Hellings, J)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON DECEMBER 19, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/28/2018. (Hernandez, M)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER CERTIFYING EXTRADITABILITY OF VLADIMIR BLASKO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2018. (Hernandez, M)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Vacating October 2, 2018 Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/28/2018. (Flores, E)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE BOND as to VLADIMAR BLASKO signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/6/2018. (Thorp, J) (Main Document 48 replaced on 8/6/2018) (Gaumnitz, R).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL PENDING EXTRADITION HEARING re 35 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/1/2018. Setting Conditions of Release set for 8/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/29/18. Extradition Hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone., Motion in Limine Hearing set for 10/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE Status Conference from 5/25/2018 to 5/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2018. (Hernandez, M)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRUE NAME FINDING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/28/2018. (Flores, E)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S PERSONAL PRESENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants appearance may be waived at the February 28, 2018 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING Motion for Bail (Doc. 16). ORDER Setting Status Conference: 3rd STATUS CONFERENCE re Extradition of Vladimar Blasko to the Slovak Republic is set for 2/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/16/2018. (Herman, H)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to UNSEAL COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. In the Matter of the Extradition of Vladimar Blasko to the Slovak Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Kevin P. Rooney(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Matter of the Extradition of Vladimar Blasko to the Slovak Republic
Represented By: Victor Manuel Chavez(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Represented By: Reed Brian Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?