Tran v. Kokor et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Tran
Defendant: Winfred Kokor, M.D. and Kayleen Powell
Case Number: 1:2018cv00010
Filed: January 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER WITHDRAWING 52 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/09/2022. CASE CLOSED.(Maldonado, C)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/13/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty-Days. (Maldonado, C)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on the assigned Deputy Attorney General. (cc: assigned Deputy Attorney General) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Kokor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfred Kokor, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayleen Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?