Lupercio v. Visalia Police Department

Plaintiff: Ramon Navarro Lupercio
Defendant: Visalia Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv00036
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's Motion to Compel, document 15 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/2/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 18, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 11 and 13 for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/18/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Request to Permit Filing of an Opposition, Construing Same as a Motion for Reconsideration, and Permitting Plaintiff to File a Supplemental Brief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/22/2018. Filing Deadline: 6/15/2018.(Flores, E)
May 15, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/14/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Service by the United States Marshal Service without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/7/18. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupercio v. Visalia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Navarro Lupercio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visalia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?