Henderson v. Dae Henderson Jr Trust
Petitioner: Dae Henderson, Jr.
Respondent: Dae Henderson Jr Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv00143
Filed: January 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the 14 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as Untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/23/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 8/27/2018. (Flores, E)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to DENY 21 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration;This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/14/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 19 Motion to Expand the Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/30/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption to reflect the name of Hunter Anglea, Warden, Sierra Conservation Center, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/16/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 2 Motion to Post Security for Fees and Costs and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 13 Motion to Take Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2018. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Dae Henderson Jr Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dae Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dae Henderson Jr Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?