Petillo v. Galliger et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah J. Petillo
Defendant: X. Galliger, M. Magana, Hernandez, L. Vasquez, Wilson and J. Fugate
Case Number: 1:2018cv00217
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 57 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Remedies be Granted re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/6/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING 60 Motion to conduct depositions by written questions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/10/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/10/2021. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/8/2021. (Response Due: 30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER VACATING 45 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Extend Time to Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/03/2021. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that that this action be dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's order issued on March 29, 2021 requiring him to pay the filing fee ;referred to Judge Unassigned DJ,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/14/2021. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER declining to adopt Findings and Recommendations 41 and granting Motion to revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 31 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/26/2021. 30-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to pay $400.00 filing fee. (Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That 31 Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Form Pauperis Status be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/8/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Rivera, O)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for court to direct Defendants to file answer signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief as Moot, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/2018. (Hellings, J)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request to Add Exhibits to First Amended Complaint 17 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint With Exhibits Attached, as Instructed by This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/27/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Be Denied 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/26/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petillo v. Galliger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah J. Petillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X. Galliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Magana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?