Mejia v. State of California
Plaintiff: Angel A. Mejia
Defendant: State of California
Case Number: 1:2018cv00220
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, Without Prejudice, Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute re 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action With Prejudice for Failure to Obey Court Order and Failure to State a Claim 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/1/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within Forty-Five (45) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel A. Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?