Whitehouse v. Signature Health Care Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Edward Whitehouse
Defendant: Signature Health Care Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00266
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER closing case 27 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/8/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISCHARGING 24 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/2019. Stipulated dismissal due by 2/8/2019. (Hall, S)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2019. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2019. (Hall, S)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AFTER 22 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 1/7/2019. Al other pending deadlines, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING the Matter to VDRP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/12/2018. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehouse v. Signature Health Care Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Whitehouse
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Health Care Services, LLC
Represented By: Sara M. Poggi
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?