Villegas v. KC Prop, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Defendant: KC Prop, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00274
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/24/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER as follows: 1) The deadline to submit Settlement Conference Statements is continued to March 26, 2019; 2) The Settlement Conference is continued to April 4, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; and 3) The deadline to serve currently outstanding discovery responses is extended to February 11, 2019. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/2019. (Rooney, M)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference for 2/14/2019 at 1:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/18/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TERMINATE Defendant KC Prop, LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Reassigning Case, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/27/18. The new case number 1:18-cv-00274-SKO. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villegas v. KC Prop, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Isabel Rose O. Masanque
Represented By: Mary Irene Melton
Represented By: Dennis J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Prop, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?