Jaco v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shirley Jaco
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00301
Filed: March 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order concerning stipulation concerning discovery dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/2021. (Non Expert Discovery due by 2/26/2021)(Rosales, O.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER granting an extension of the following deadlines and hearings: Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/12/2021; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/28/2020 (unchanged); Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/28/2020 (unc hanged); Expert Discovery due by 2/12/2021; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/5/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; and Jury Trial set for 10/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/21/2020. (Rooney, M)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Staying the Case Pending Appeal signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/26/2019. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/19 ORDERING the Court received the Notices of Related Cases filed on 4/4/19. The Court has determined, however, that it is inappropriate to relate or reassign the cases, and therefore declines to do so. This Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases, including any previous Related (or Non-Related) Case Order of this Court. (Becknal, R)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 4 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within Thirty (30) Days of this order; ORDERED that this case be referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for the setting of a scheduling conference, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/31/19. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order on third stipulation to continue initial scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/12/2019. The parties shall contact the Court to reset the Initial Scheduling Conference within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of a ruling on the motion. (Rosales, O.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/15/2018 and CONTINUING it to 11/13/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/2018. (Rooney, M)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/27/2018 and CONTINUING it to 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/11/2018. (Rooney, M)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/2018 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to issue an order relating the cases. Defendant'srequest is DENIED without prejudice. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaco v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Jaco
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Davey
Represented By: Robin G. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Marie Launey
Represented By: Christopher J. Truxler
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?