Beasor v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: John Beasor
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00337
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice, ORDER VACATING April 23, 2018 Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days.(Marrujo, C)
March 20, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to April 23, 2018,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/20/18. (Case Management Deadline: 4/9/2018, Replies due by 4/16/2018, Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 14, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal; new case number is 1:18-cv-00337 LJO-SAB, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/13/18. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasor v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Beasor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?