Raul Gonzales, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Raul Gonzales, Jr.
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC and National Credit Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00345
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/13/2018. (Hall, S)
December 10, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to PLAINTIFF and HIS ATTORNEY to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/10/2018. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2018. (Hall, S)
June 1, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/1/2018. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/31/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/15/2018; Non-Expert 3/1/2019; Expert 4/26/2019. M id-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/3/2019; Hearing by 5/31/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Fi led by 6/11/2019; Hearing by 7/23/2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul Gonzales, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Jared Hartman
Represented By: Geoff B. McCarrell, PHV
Represented By: Babak Semnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Kurtis Jeffery Anders
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Represented By: Heather M. Shumaker, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?