Shin, et al. v. Yoon, et al.
Plaintiff: Su Jung Shin and Hyun Ju Shin
Defendant: Robert Young Yoon, Kyoung Mee Yoon, Kyoung Sup Yoon, Y & Y Property Management, Inc., The Victus Group, Inc. and Blackstone Seattle, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00381
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: STAY of Entire Case Against Remaining Parties signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST JUDGMENT DEBTORS; AND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONDITIONAL RELEASES FROM LIABILITY BY ALL PARTIES signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/10/2019. (Gonzales, V)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: (Telephonic) PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for set for 9/11/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/19/2019. (Kusamura, W)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COUNTERCOMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/19/2019. (Kusamura, W) (Main Document 44 replaced on 3/19/2019) (Kusamura, W).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER relating and reassigning case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/1/2018. The new case number is 1:18-cv-00381-AWI-SKO.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shin, et al. v. Yoon, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Su Jung Shin
Represented By: David Hyunjean Rho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyun Ju Shin
Represented By: David Hyunjean Rho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Young Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyoung Mee Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyoung Sup Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y & Y Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Victus Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Seattle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?