Brooke v. Patel
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: Naresh Khushboo Patel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00444
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order STRIKING 15 Notice of Withdrawal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2018. (Rosales, O)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Discharging 12 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/12/2018. (Flores, E)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR. Accordingly, the Court HEREBY ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE on or before July 17, 2018, why sanctions should not issue for the failure to appear at the July 11, 2018 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooke v. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naresh Khushboo Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?