Renteria v. Matharu et al
Plaintiff: Luis Renteria
Defendant: Kabir Matharu, Jeffery Wang, S. Lopez and A. Sotelo
Case Number: 1:2018cv00497
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Case be Dismissed, Without Prejudice, for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/21/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/18/2019: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Re Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time 25 , FORTY-FIVE DAY DEADLINE for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/4/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Request to Withdraw First Amended Complaint and Proceed With Original Complaint 23 ; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to the Screening Order Issued on December 14, 2018 22 ; Thirty-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/12/2019. (Hellings, J)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 16 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's Requests for copies 18 , 19 ; directing Clerk to re-service Findings and Recommendations 17 and send a copy of the docket report for this case to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/1/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/26/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 4 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/3/18. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renteria v. Matharu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabir Matharu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sotelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?