Grubb v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Grubb
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00511
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/3/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 11, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS ON OR BEFORE JULY 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
June 6, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO ALLOW CONTINUED SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Companys response to the complaint shall be filed on or before June 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2018. (Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Aetna Life Insurance Companys response to the complaint shall be filed on or before June 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/2018. (Hernandez, M)
May 8, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant Trustee of the Aviation Health Association Insurance Trust 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/8/2018. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grubb v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Grubb
Represented By: Todd Bradley Krauss
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan Shae Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?