Kirchner v. Biter et al
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kirchner
Defendant: M. Biter, C. Pfeiffer, S. Henderson, J. Harden, J. S. Diaz, J. Perez, S. Tollerico, R. Pimentel, S. Cooper and D. Tarnoff
Case Number: 1:2018cv00516
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/17/2021. Settlement Statement due by 5/14/2021; Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Late Filing 35 and VACATING Findings and Recommendations 33 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/25/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of Defendant, Perez without prejudice for failure to serve signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/17/2021. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Defendants' Request for extension of time to file response to First Amended Complaint 31 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/16/2021. (Filing Deadline: 3/18/2021). (Lundstrom, T)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Perez Should Not be Dismissed From this Action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/28/2020. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 20 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/15/2020.(Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 19 ; Referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/19/2018. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirchner v. Biter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. S. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tollerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pimentel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tarnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?