Barboza v. Stengel
Plaintiff: Mark Lee Barboza
Defendant: Sean Stengel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00580
Filed: April 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Mark Lee Barboza, #H-69098, to the Sacramento Courthouse at 501 I Street, Sacramento, California, on September 19, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom #25, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/15/19. (Gonzalez, R)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/12/2019. Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Flores, E)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Adopting 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/24/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that all claims be dismissed, except for Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Sean Stengel for excessive force in violation of the eighth amendment re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ;referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barboza v. Stengel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lee Barboza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Stengel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?