Woodson v. Kern County Child Support Services
Plaintiff: Jason Woodson
Defendant: Kern County Child Support Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00726
Filed: May 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing the Action Without Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/2018. Referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for His Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and His Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/23/2018. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to File an Amended Complaint No Later Than October 22, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/2018. (Hall, S)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/2018. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodson v. Kern County Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?