(PC) Frank E. Peters v. Norris Hollie et al
Plaintiff: Frank E Peters
Defendant: Does 1-10, Norris Hollie, Evelyn G. Castro, Mahesh B. Patel, Craig Apker, Conrad M. Graber, Stephanie Hicks and Burnet T. Rucker
Case Number: 1:2018cv01230
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:18-CV1230 LJO-EPG (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 76 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Frank E Peters. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Burnet T. Rucker. (Strottman, Kristina)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-02466.
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #74 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Frank E Peters. (Flores, E)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, transferring case to Eastern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS HOLLIE, APKER, RUCKER AND HICKS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #67 filed by Plaintiff Frank E Peters. (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P 41(a) or (c) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #69 . Mahesh B. Patel (HSA), Evelyn G. Castro (MD. ) and Conrad M. Graber (Warden, FCI Terminal Island) terminated. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff (Defendants) Evelyn G. Castro, Mahesh B. Patel, Conrad M. Graber pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Evelyn G. Castro, Mahesh B. Patel, Conrad M. Graber. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Plaintiff's opposition, or notice of non-opposition, to the motion must be served and filed on or before May 25, 2018. An opposition should be limited to issues raised in the motion to dismiss. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Burnet T. Rucker. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Gruenberg, Kristina) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #65 GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN, the Defendants shall have up to and including May 8, 2018, to respond to the First Amended Complaint. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint #64 filed by Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS)(Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 against Defendants Craig Apker, Evelyn G. Castro, Conrad M. Graber, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Mahesh B. Patel, Burnet T. Rucker filed by Plaintiff Frank E Peters. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: moot #60 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The Court issuedits Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend which gives a twenty-one(21) day deadline for which Plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for 4th Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause to March 22, 2017 filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. (iva) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: #32 MOTION to Dismiss Case. The Court GRANTS MovingDefendants motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, with leave to amend. (Attachments: #1 Blank CV Rights Form, #2 Voluntary Dismissal) (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: withdrawing #55 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File; granting #57 APPLICATION for Order. Defendants Conrad M. Graber's andMahesh B. Patel's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to March 23, 2018. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint (Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Marcus M. Kerner in Support of Application filed by Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS) (Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File #55 filed by Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. (Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File the Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS) (Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marcus M Kerner counsel for Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. Adding Marcus M. Kerner as counsel of record for Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Conrad M. Graber, Mahesh B. Patel. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Attorney Marcus M Kerner added to party Conrad M. Graber(pty:dft), Attorney Marcus M Kerner added to party Mahesh B. Patel(pty:dft))(Kerner, Marcus) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The Court GRANTS Mr. Peters extension of time to February 22, 2018 in which to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause or provide a status report. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for 3rd Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause and Motion for Time to Provide the Court a Status Report as to Ben Shmuel's Response to the Subpoena for the US Marshal's to Complete Service filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Conrad M. Graber served on 11/3/2017, answer due 11/24/2017, served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Susan Graber, Wife. Remarks: 1st Attempt at 8;30 AM - No one home and left business card w/instruction to call on 11/3/17. 1 Deputy. 5 hours. 76 rd trip miles. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The Court GRANTS Mr. Peters extension of time to January 19, 2018 in which to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause and Motion Requesting This Court to Direct the US Marshals Service to Contact the Legal Department of the United States Bureau of Prisons filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. (iva) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The Court has read Plaintiff's motion and GRANTS and extension of time to December 14, 2017 in which to respond to the Courts Order to Show Cause. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEfiled by Plaintiff Frank E Peters. (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank E Peters, Attorney General served on 10/13/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to not indicated (mailed). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Burnet T. Rucker. (Gruenberg, Kristina) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Mahesh B. Patel served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017, (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Conrad M. Graber served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017, (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SERVICE PACKAGE INCLUEDS: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #38 and associated documents and (6) USM 285-forms sent via US mail to plaintiff. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order To Show Cause As To Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed As To Defendants Patel, Castro, and Graber by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why the Court should not dismiss his claims against defendants Patel, Castro, and Graber for failure to serve and/or failure to prosecute. Accordingly, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit against these three defendants, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Order Re Dismiss) (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Plaintiff Frank E Peters. (ad) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Does served on 9/6/2017, answer due 9/27/2017, served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Patricia Myles, Civil Process Clerk. Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waivers; 1 DVSM, 1 hr, 2 miles. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Norris Hollie served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017, Remarks: 6/23/17 mailed letter waiver, Received signed waiver letter. (sbou) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons unexecuted re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 for Evelyn G. Castro. (sbou) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons unexecuted filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. as to Evelyn G. Castro. individual and official capacity ( advised by BOP defendant has retired. No forwarding information available (Attachments: # 1 usm 285)(sbu) Modified on 3/21/2018 (sbou). [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. upon Norris Hollie waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2017, answer due 8/22/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Susan E. Coleman attorney for Defendant. (sbu) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Norris Hollie individual and official served on 8/31/2017, answer due 9/21/2017, served by Legal evidence of service service, by Federal statute, upon U S Marshal. Remarks: 6/23/17 mailed letter waiver. Received signed waiver letter. (sbu) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2017: # 1) (sbu). Modified on 9/7/2017 (sbu). Modified on 3/21/2018 (sbou). [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: #32 Order Re: Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opposition, or notice of non-opposition, to the Motion must be served and filedby September 28, 2017. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served and filed by October 12, 2017. Unless otherwise ordered, the Motion will be taken under submission, without oral argument, when briefing is complete, and the parties will be notified by mail or email of all further proceedings. (dc) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Burnet T. Rucker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Gruenberg, Kristina) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg counsel for Defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Burnet T. Rucker. Adding Kristina Doan Gruenberg as counsel of record for Norris Hollie, M.D., Craig Apker, Burnett Rucker, M.D. and Stephanie Hicks, R.N. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Norris Hollie, M.D., Craig Apker, Burnet T. Rucker, M.D. and Stephanie Hicks, R.N.. (Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party Craig Apker(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party Stephanie Hicks(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party Norris Hollie(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Doan Gruenberg added to party Burnet T. Rucker(pty:dft))(Gruenberg, Kristina) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan E Coleman counsel for Defendant Norris Hollie. Adding Susan E. Coleman as counsel of record for Norris Hollie for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Norris Hollie. (Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party Norris Hollie(pty:dft))(Coleman, Susan) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 17-109 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:17-cv-02466 VBF (SHK) absent further order of the Court. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters, upon Craig Apker. Waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2017, answer due 8/22/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Susan E. Coleman, Attorney for Defendant. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint #1 upon Craig Apker (warden). Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waiver; 7/24/17- received signed waiver. (RECEIVED C/CA, MARSHALS SERVICE JUN 21, 2017 2:33PM) (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint #1 upon Craig Apker served on 7/25/2017, answer due 8/15/2017. Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waivers; 7/24/17-received signed waiver. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters upon Burnet T. Rucker, waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2017, answer due 8/22/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Susan E. Coleman, Attorney for Defendant. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint #1 upon Burnet T. Rucker; Remarks: 6/23/17; mailed letter waiver; 7/24/17 received signed waiver.(Received C/CA U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE- JUNE 21, 2017 2:29) (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. Served upon Stephanie Hicks, on 7/6/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Susan E. Coleman. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint #1 upon Burnet T. Rucker served on 7/25/2017, answer due 8/15/2017, Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waiver; 7/24/17-received signed waiver. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint #1 upon Stephanie Hicks. Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waiver; 7/24/17- received signed waiver. (gr) Modified on 8/2/2017 (gr). [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 upon Stephanie Hicks served on 7/25/2017, answer due 8/15/2017, Remarks: 6/23/17-mailed letter waiver; 7/24/17- received signed waiver. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: re: Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), #13 .The Courts order required Plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.00. (Id.) However, because Plaintiff is no longer incarcerated, Plaintiff was not required to pay any filing fee. Accordingly, the Courts May 3 order is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiffs initial partial filing fee of $1.00 shall be refunded. (sbu) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Burnet T. Rucker, identifying Management & Training Corporation. (Coleman, Susan) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan E Coleman counsel for Defendants Craig Apker, Stephanie Hicks, Burnet T. Rucker. Adding Susan E. Coleman as counsel of record for Craig Apker, Burnet T. Rucker, M.D. and Stephanie Hicks, R.N. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Craig Apker, Burnet T. Rucker, M.D. and Stephanie Hicks, R.N.. (Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party Craig Apker(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party Stephanie Hicks(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E Coleman added to party Burnet T. Rucker(pty:dft))(Coleman, Susan) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE documents submitted to USM filed by plaintiff Frank E Peters. (sbu) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, RE: Complaint #1 ,Order directing service #7 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Marshal is authorized to proceed with service of process upon the following defendants only without prepayment of cost, until further Order of the Court: Norris Rollie,Burnet T. Rucker, Stephanie Hicks, Craig Apker, Evelyn G. Castro, Mahesh B. Patel and Conrad M. Graber. Upon receipt of this order, the United States Marshal may request that the defendants) waive service. If a waiver of service is not returned by a defendant within thirty (30) days of the date of mailing a request for waiver, the United States Marshal shall personally serve process upon that defendant. (sbu) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 as to Defendants Craig Apker, Evelyn G. Castro, Conrad M. Graber, Stephanie Hicks, Norris Hollie, Mahesh B. Patel, Burnet T. Rucker. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. Further ORDER an Initial Partial Filing Fee of $1.00 to be paid. #11 (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS (Docket # 9) by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for an extension of time. #9 Plaintiff shall file the Notice of Submission by June 3, 2017. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES WITH DECLARATION IN SUPPORT filed by plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of address, changing Plaintiff's address to Frank Peters, 73-650 Pinyon street, Palm Desert, CA 92260. Filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS TO UNITED STATES MARSHAL filed by plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES [3, 4] by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. On March 30, 2017, the Court received from Plaintiff a Request for Order For United States Marshal to Perform Service of Process. (Dkt. No. 3.) In Plaintiff's Request, he references a declaration in support of a request to proceed without prepayment of filing fees. (Id.) Plaintiff's Request is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. #3 #4 (Attachments: #1 CV-60P) (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. IT IS ORDERED as follows: No later than May 3, 2017, Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court aNotice of Submission indicating that all required documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal for service of the Complaint. The form for this Notice of Submission is attached to this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff shall file copies of the USM-285 forms submitted to the United States Marshal.If Plaintiff does not file the Notice of Submission by May 3, 2017,this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. #1 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION, #2 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, #3 INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE) (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), service of the summons and complaint generally must be accomplished within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. The complaint herein was filed on March 30, 2017. However, since the Court screened the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A(b), the Court shall extend the 90-day period to commence as of the date of this Order. Accordingly, the 90-day period will expire on August 1, 2017. #1 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) as to Plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (car) Modified on 4/3/2017 (car). [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR UNITED STATES MARSHALL TO PERFORM SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters (car) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, filed by Plaintiff Frank E. Peters. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 9/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Frank E. Peters v. Norris Hollie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Hollie
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn G. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahesh B. Patel
Represented By: Marcus M. Kerner, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Apker
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad M. Graber
Represented By: Marcus M. Kerner, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Hicks
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnet T. Rucker
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?