(PC) Fletcher v. Sherman
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Fletcher
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01317
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gregory L. Fletcher. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory L. Fletcher. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05528.
September 25, 2018 Electronically transferred case to the Eastern District of California (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) [Transferred from cand on 9/25/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 9/25/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory L. Fletcher. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from cand on 9/25/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Stu Sherman Filed byGregory L. Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from cand on 9/25/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fletcher v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?