Jones-Walbaum Corporation v. YRC Worldwide Inc.
Plaintiff: Jones-Walbaum Corporation
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01334
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by YRC Worldwide Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; New case number 1:18-cv-1334 JLT, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/06/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by YRC Worldwide Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jones-Walbaum Corporation. (Potter, David)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Jones-Walbaum Corporation. (Potter, David)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jones-Walbaum Corporation. (Potter, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER by YRC Worldwide Inc., a Delaware corporation, doing business as YRC Freight.(Jeffries, Kathleen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-18-101958 TSC by Jones-Walbaum Corporation, a California corporation, doing business as American Business Machines. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7889280) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Notice to Counsel of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jeffries, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Walbaum Corporation v. YRC Worldwide Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones-Walbaum Corporation
Represented By: David B. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?