(HC) Cruz v. Price
Petitioner: Peter Casey Cruz
Respondent: Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2018cv01360
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file response to petition for writ of habeas corpus by Brandon Price. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service)(Hokans, Julie)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order on Motion for Extension served on Peter Casey Cruz. (Sant Agata, S)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brandon Price. Attorney Hokans, Julie Anne added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hokans, Julie)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-1360 AWI-JLT HC. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Peter Casey Cruz. (Flores, E)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Peter Casey Cruz. (Flores, E)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE RE IFP by Peter Casey Cruz. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT for Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/18. Consent or Decline due by 11/8/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Authorizing In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/18. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 12/6/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Peter Casey Cruz. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Peter Casey Cruz. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-02025.
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Peter Casey Cruz. (Marrujo, C)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Josephine L. Staton transferring case to Eastern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 10/2/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 . Proposed Order re transfer forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml) [Transferred from cacd on 10/2/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/2/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by petitioner Peter Casey Cruz. The petitioner does not consent. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/2/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Peter Casey Cruz. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Cruz v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Price
Represented By: Julie Anne Hokans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Casey Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?