(SS) Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Angelique Nicole Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01372
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2018 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney McAdam, S. Wyeth added. (McAdam, S.)
October 23, 2018 6 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Original and 5 copies of Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, 5 copies of the order directing service by USM and 5 copies of the Complaint by Angelique Nicole Hernandez. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Summons, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Angelique Nicole Hernandez. (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2018 5 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Angelique Nicole Hernandez, Pro Se* *193 W. Sample Avenue* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions) (Lundstrom, T)
October 10, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2018 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Angelique Nicole Hernandez. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2018 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Angelique Nicole Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelique Nicole Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?