(DP) Tobin v. Davis

Petitioner: Christopher Allan Tobin
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 1:2018cv01375
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Following Case Management Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/18. Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 11/9/2018. The Court to issue written order. Plaintiff's Counsel Lindsay Bennett & Carrie Ward, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Galen Farris, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: K. Hooven. (Timken, A)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED EVENT. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lindsay Bennett on behalf of Christopher Allan Tobin. Attorney Bennett, Lindsay added. (Bennett, Lindsay)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/22/2018. (Flores, E)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Galen Neale Farris on behalf of Ronald Davis. Attorney Farris, Galen Neale added. (Farris, Galen)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ASSIGNING Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone to this Action signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/18/2018. New Case Number 1:18-cv-1375 LJO-SAB. (Flores, E)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/10/2018. (Flores, E)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Christopher Allan Tobin. (Flores, E)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Christopher Allan Tobin, CDC E-54004 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T).
October 5, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Death Penalty Case. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher Allan Tobin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Culshaw, Kelly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel by Christopher Allan Tobin. Attorney Culshaw, Kelly L. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher A. Tobin)(Culshaw, Kelly) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (DP) Tobin v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler
Represented By: Galen Neale Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Allan Tobin
Represented By: Kelly L. Culshaw
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Corey Mann
Represented By: Lindsay Bennett
Represented By: Carrie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?