(PC) Davis v. California Correctional Institution Trust Office Officials et al

Plaintiff: Terrence Lamont Davis
Defendant: M. Dailo, D. Gallegos, D. Perez, R. Lesina, Blackburn, Kelli Drady, W. J. Sullivan, Litigation Office Officials, K. Choppel and California Correctional Institution Trust Office Officials
Case Number: 1:2018cv01393
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion for Extension served on Terrence Lamont Davis. (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to file objections to Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2018. Objections to F&R due by 1/2/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Lundstrom, T)
November 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Findings and Recommendations served on Terrence Lamont Davis. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File a Completed In Forma Pauperis Application; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #8 & #9 Plaintiff's Motions for Injunctive Relief be DENIED re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Motion for IFP due within thirty (30) days. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of MOTION Requesting an Immediate Issuance of Court Mandate for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Restraining Order on CCI Tehachapi Officials and Their Acting Agents by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Jessen, A)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of MOTION Requesting a Mandated or Against Defendants of Afore Stipulated Filed Previously Requests for Need Injunctional Relief Due to Ongoing Harassments Impeding Access to the Court's Perjury and Tyranny by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Jessen, A)
November 1, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Terrence Lamont Davis. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Directing that he be provided law library access #5 be Denied ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Terrence Lamont Davis. (Sant Agata, S)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on CCI Tehachapi. (Gonzalez, R)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *10/10/2018*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Blackburn, California Correctional Institution Trust Office Officials, K. Choppel, M. Dailo, Kelli Drady, D. Gallegos, R. Lesina, Litigation Office Officials, D. Perez, W. J. Sullivan by Terrence Lamont Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Davis v. California Correctional Institution Trust Office Officials et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dailo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lesina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Drady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litigation Office Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Choppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Institution Trust Office Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Lamont Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?