(PC) Froemel v. California Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Rocky Devon Froemel
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, California State Superior Courts, California State Attorney General and California Parole Hearing Board
Case Number: 1:2018cv01396
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Rocky Devon Froemel. (Jessen, A)
November 19, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER Regarding #7 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and ORDER TERMINATING #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Rocky Devon Froemel. (Marrujo, C)
November 15, 2018 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rocky Devon Froemel. (Marrujo, C)
November 15, 2018 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rocky Devon Froemel. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Rocky Devon Froemel. (Flores, E)
October 15, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2018. Forty-Five Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form)(Flores, E)
October 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Rocky Devon Froemel. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER SEVERING Plaintiff's Claims and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Open New Actions for Plaintiffs Froemel and Davis signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rocky Devon Froemel.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Froemel v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Superior Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Parole Hearing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Devon Froemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?