(PC) Van Gessel v. Moore et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Van Gessel
Defendant: Altuire, Dr. Thomas Moore, USP Atwater and Ballesil
Case Number: 1:2018cv01478
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christopher Allen Van Gessel. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Christopher Allen Van Gessel. (Hellings, J)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Christopher Allen Van Gessel. (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher Allen Van Gessel. (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 (BIVENS) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Christopher Allen Gessel.(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Van Gessel v. Moore et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altuire
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas Moore
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Atwater
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballesil
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Van Gessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?