Ochoa v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ochoa
Defendant: County of Kern, Deputy Andrew Bassett and Deputy Brock
Case Number: 1:2018cv01599
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Andrew Bassett, Brock, County of Kern. Attorney Thomson, Andrew C. added.(Thomson, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Andrew Bassett served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Dunn, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brock served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Dunn, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Kern served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Dunn, Brian)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Andrew Bassett, Brock, County of Kern* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian T. Dunn* *The Cochran Firm* *4929 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1010* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deputy Andrew Bassett, Deputy Brock, County of Kern, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive by Alejandro Ochoa. Attorney Dunn, Brian T. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7976320) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Andrew Bassett
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Brock
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ochoa
Represented By: Megan Ruth Gyongyos
Represented By: Brian T. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?